ROOSE LOCAL MINISTRY AREA COUNCIL CIO

Charity number: 1203513
Charity reporting is up to date (1 day late)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Activities undertaken for public benefit include: 1. providing resources and facilities for public worship 2. pastoral care notably in visiting the sick and bereaved, 3. spiritual, moral, and intellectual teaching and development 4. youth, children's and social clubs and activities which promote Christian values 5. provision and upkeep of Church halls for the Church and community.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023

Total income: £230,100
Total expenditure: £192,669

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Religious Activities
Who the charity helps:
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
  • Provides Services
Where the charity operates:
  • Pembrokeshire

Governance

Registration history:
  • 12 June 2023: CIO registration
Organisation type:
CIO
Other names:
  • THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE UNITED BENEFICE OF ROOSE (Working name)
Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Complaints handling
  • Conflicting interests
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

26 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
YVONNE GRACE SOUTHWELL Chair 09 January 2023
THE TORCH THEATRE COMPANY LIMITED
Received: On time
YVONNE CLARE EVANS Trustee 09 January 2023
COASTLANDS LOCAL HISTORY GROUP (CIO)
Received: On time
WOMEN'S INSTITUTE DALE
Received: On time
Rev Andrew Paul Johnson Trustee 09 January 2023
THE PEMBROKESHIRE GUILD OF WEAVERS, SPINNERS AND DYERS
Received: On time
Canon John Richard Cecil Trustee 09 January 2023
ST DAVIDS DIOCESAN BOARD OF FINANCE
Received: On time
THE DEAN AND CHAPTER OF ST DAVIDS CATHEDRAL
Received: On time
KATHRYN MARY MORGAN Trustee 09 January 2023
WALWYNS CASTLE VILLAGE HALL
Received: On time
Rev Alan Michael Chadwick Trustee 09 January 2023
HOPE PEMBROKESHIRE
Received: On time
THE FRIENDS OF ST TUDWAL'S, LLANSTADWELL
Recently registered
Dr Christine Link Trustee 09 January 2023
ST MADOC OF FERNS COMMUNITY GROUP
Received: On time
JOSEPHINE MARY OWENS Trustee 09 January 2023
None on record
Pamela Hay Trustee 09 January 2023
None on record
Andrew Desborough Trustee 09 January 2023
None on record
Stephen John Traynar Trustee 09 January 2023
None on record
Michael Adrian Armstrong Trustee 09 January 2023
None on record
Doris Gwendoline James Trustee 09 January 2023
None on record
Jaqueline Davies Trustee 09 January 2023
None on record
Shirley Margaret Johns Trustee 09 January 2023
None on record
Rev GAYNOR FORD Trustee 09 January 2023
None on record
Rev John Marcus Zipperlen Trustee 09 January 2023
None on record
Tracy-Jane Ashcroft Trustee 09 January 2023
None on record
Catherine Mary Davies Trustee 09 January 2023
None on record
Kathleen Gillian Thorne Trustee 09 January 2023
None on record
Graham Coombe Evans Trustee 09 January 2023
None on record
Marion Jane Preddy Trustee 09 January 2023
None on record
HEATHER ELIZABETH PHIPPEN Trustee 09 January 2023
None on record
Nicola Sarah Davies Trustee 09 January 2023
None on record
JEAN FORSYTH BUCKINGHAM Trustee 09 January 2023
GELLISWICK BAY CHARITY
Received: On time
JOHN STUART BRAMLEY Trustee 09 January 2023
THE INGLES CHARITABLE TRUST
Received: On time

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2023
Total gross income £230.10k
Total expenditure £192.67k
Income from government contracts N/A
Income from government grants N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2023 01 November 2024 1 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2023 01 November 2024 1 days late Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
68 Church Road
Llanstadwell
MILFORD HAVEN
SA73 1EB
Phone:
01646600227
Website:

No information available