LUTON SIKH SOUP KITCHEN

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Information on the charity's activities is not available.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

3 Trustee(s)
10 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Luton
Governance
- 26 June 2023: CIO registration
No other names
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Baljinder Ahir Mr | Chair |
|
|
|||||
Ashwinder Singh Mr | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
Joginder Bains Mrs | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £6.46k | |
|
Total expenditure | £8.47k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 30 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 30 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - ASSOCIATION Registered 26 Jun 2023
Charitable objects
TO RELIEVE PERSONS IN LUTON AND LOCAL SURROUNDING AREAS WHO ARE IN CONDITIONS OF NEED, HARDSHIP OR DISTRESS BY PROVIDING FREE FOOD AND IN SUCH OTHER WAYS AS THE TRUSTEES FROM TIME TO TIME THINK FIT, THEREBY DEMONSTRATING THE VALUES OF SIKH SEVA (SELFESS SERVICE). NOTHING IN THIS CONSTITUTION SHALL AUTHORISE AN APPLICATION OF THE PROPERTY OF THE CIO FOR THE PURPOSES WHICH ARE NOT CHARITABLE.
Contact information
- Address:
-
142-143 PARROCK STREET
GRAVESEND
KENT
DA12 1EY
- Phone:
- 07782348801
- Website:
-
WWW.LUTONSIKHSOUPKITCHEN.CO.UK
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window