Financial history MARDEN COMMUNITY CENTRE

Charity number: 522122
Charity reporting is overdue by 202 days
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2015 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019
Total gross income £5.82k £1.83k £4.89k £3.79k £5.78k
Total expenditure £5.98k £2.57k £4.33k £6.76k £5.76k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A