Financial history WALKERVILLE COMMUNITY ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 522145
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/09/2017 30/09/2018 30/09/2019 30/09/2020 30/09/2021
Total gross income £17.47k £16.21k £20.41k £20.41k £11.67k
Total expenditure £12.83k £41.31k £15.00k £15.00k £15.02k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A