Siyakhanya
Trosolwg o'r elusen
Gweithgareddau - sut mae'r elusen yn gwario ei harian
At present the charity is focused on providing support to the South African NGO 'ACAT KZN' which works across KwaZulu-Natal province, South Africa to enable poor people to improve their livelihoods.
Beth, pwy, sut, ble
- Rhoi Cymorth I’r Tlodion
- Rhoi Grantiau I Sefydliadau
- De Affrica
Llywodraethu
- 17 Mehefin 2024: y derbyniwyd cronfeydd gan 271713 HELWEL TRUST
- 16 Awst 2023: CIO registration
- REPOSA (Enw blaenorol)
Ymddiriedolwyr
Ymddiriedolwyr yw’r bobl sy’n gyfrifol am reoli’ gwaith, rheolaeth a gweinyddiaeth yr elusen. Gellir adnabod ymddiriedolwyr wrth enwau eraill megis cyfarwyddwyr, aelodau pwyllgor, llywodraethwyr neu rywbeth arall, ac nid ydynt fel arfer wedi’u cyflogi gan yr elusen. Mae’r ymddiriedolwyr yn gyfrifol am ddiweddaru'r rhestr hon a gallant wneud hyn wrth ddiweddaru eu manylion fel y maent yn digwydd trwy'r gwasanaeth ar-lein.
5 Ymddiriedolwyr
Enw | Rôl | Dyddiad y penodiad | Ymddiriedolaethau eraill | Statws adrodd ymddiriedolaethau eraill | ||||||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Nigel Taylor | Cadeirydd | 16 August 2023 |
|
|
||||||||||
Dr Susan Miranda Young | Ymddiriedolwr | 13 September 2024 |
|
|
||||||||||
AMANDA JANE ARTHURTON | Ymddiriedolwr | 27 November 2023 |
|
|
||||||||||
Andrew Pemberton | Ymddiriedolwr | 16 August 2023 |
|
|||||||||||
Rev Philip Dorling | Ymddiriedolwr | 16 August 2023 |
|
|
Hanes ariannol
Cyfrifon a datganiadau enillion blynyddol
Dogfen lywodraethu
Dogfen lywodraethu
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu'r elusen.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 16 Aug 2023 as amended on 01 Dec 2023
Gwrthrychau elusennol
THE PREVENTION OR RELIEF OF POVERTY, IN AFRICA, IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY IN THE PROVINCE OF KWAZULU-NATAL, SOUTH AFRICA, BY PROVIDING GRANTS, ITEMS AND SERVICES TO CHRISTIAN ORGANISATIONS WORKING TO PREVENT OR RELIEVE POVERTY, PARTICULARLY BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY THROUGH EQUIPPING THOSE LIVING IN POVERTY WITH KNOWLEDGE AND LIFE SKILLS TO ENABLE THEM TO OVERCOME POVERTY IN THEIR OWN LIVES, AND TO INFLUENCE AND ASSIST OTHERS TO ACHIEVE THE SAME. FOR THE PURPOSE OF THIS CLAUSE, "CHRISTIAN ORGANISATIONS" MAY MEAN ANY THAT ADHERE TO TRADITIONAL AND ORTHODOX CHRISTIAN FAITH AND PRACTICE.
Contact Information
- Cyfeiriad yr elusen:
-
COURT COTTAGE
BADGWORTH
AXBRIDGE
BS26 2QJ
- Ffôn:
- 07910895679
- E-bost:
- sawubona@siyakhanya.org
- Gwefan:
-
Dim gwybodaeth ar gael
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.