COTGRAVE SOCIAL WELFARE CENTRE

Charity number: 522205
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2020 04 May 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 04 May 2021 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2019 26 March 2021 146 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 26 March 2021 146 days late Download
Annual return 31 December 2018 23 October 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2018

(These accounts
have been qualified)

23 October 2019 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2017 15 September 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2017 15 September 2018 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2016 30 August 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2016 30 August 2017 On time Download