HOLBECK AND WELBECK VILLAGE HALL

Charity number: 522226
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

The charity operates in the Nottinghamshire area to the general public supplying facilities and open space etc.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023

Total income: £49,169
Total expenditure: £115,265

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Amateur Sport
Who the charity helps:
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
Where the charity operates:
  • Nottinghamshire

Governance

Registration history:
  • 13 November 1963: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:
  • THE LADY MARGARET HALL (Working name)
Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
No policies declared
Land and property:
This charity owns and/or leases land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

2 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
WILLIAM HENRY MARCELLO PARENTE Trustee
SKYLARKS ENDOWMENT FUND
Received: On time
FAI - ITALIAN HERITAGE TRUST
Received: On time
THE WELBECK ESTATES CO TITLE LTD Trustee
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £2.90k £256 £4.12k £8.10k £49.17k
Total expenditure £13.58k £11.78k £475.83k £27.44k £115.27k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2023 28 October 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2023 28 October 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2022 31 October 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2021 10 October 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2020 25 October 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2019 22 October 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 Not Required
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
Cavendish House
Welbeck
Worksop
S80 3LL
Phone:
01909500211
Email:
No information available
Website:

No information available