CLIFTON MINERS' WELFARE TRUST

Charity number: 522268
Charity reporting is overdue by 1675 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 June 2020 Overdue Overdue by 214 days
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2020 Overdue Overdue by 214 days
Annual return 30 June 2019 Overdue Overdue by 579 days
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2019 Overdue Overdue by 579 days
Annual return 30 June 2018 Overdue Overdue by 945 days
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2018 Overdue Overdue by 945 days
Annual return 30 June 2017 Overdue Overdue by 1310 days
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2017 Overdue Overdue by 1310 days
Annual return 30 June 2016 Overdue Overdue by 1675 days
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2016 Overdue Overdue by 1675 days