ST AIDAN'S COMMUNITY CENTRE CIO
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Maintenance and management of St Aidan's Community Centre, Brunton Park
What, who, how, where
- Recreation
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Newcastle Upon Tyne City
Governance
- 12 October 2023: CIO registration
- BRUNTON PARK COMMUNITY CENTRE (Working name)
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
14 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Leigh Anne Geddes | Chair | 26 March 2024 |
|
|
||||
Sylvia Lucinda Evans | Trustee | 26 June 2024 |
|
|||||
BRIAN DUELL | Trustee | 26 March 2024 |
|
|||||
JESSICA MARY MCLEAVY CARR | Trustee | 26 March 2024 |
|
|||||
SUSAN MARY COATES | Trustee | 26 March 2024 |
|
|||||
Dr HELEN MARIE WATSON | Trustee | 26 March 2024 |
|
|||||
Tracey Gasper | Trustee | 26 March 2024 |
|
|||||
Frederick Barrie Todd | Trustee | 26 March 2024 |
|
|||||
Christopher Brodie Watson | Trustee | 26 March 2024 |
|
|||||
David Spencer | Trustee | 26 March 2024 |
|
|||||
Julie Seaton | Trustee | 26 March 2024 |
|
|||||
Ollwyn Ann Farrell | Trustee | 26 March 2024 |
|
|||||
Patricia Margaret Spong | Trustee | 26 March 2024 |
|
|||||
David Christopher Down | Trustee | 27 February 2024 |
|
Financial history
Accounts and annual returns
Governing document
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - ASSOCIATION Registered 12 Oct 2023
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE THE BENEFIT OF THE INHABITANTS RESIDENTS OF BRUNTON PARK AND MELTON PARK, NORTH GOSFORTH IN THE CITY OF NEWCASTLE UPON TYNE AND THE NEIGHBOURHOOD (HEREINAFTER CALLED “THE AREA OF BENEFIT”) WITHOUT DISTINCTION OF SEX, SEXUAL ORIENTATION, RACE OR OF POLITICAL, RELIGIOUS OR OTHER OPINIONS BY ASSOCIATING TOGETHER THE SAID RESIDENTS AND THE LOCAL AUTHORITIES, VOLUNTARY AND OTHER ORGANISATIONS AND INHABITANTS IN A COMMON EFFORT TO ADVANCE EDUCATION AND TO PROVIDE FACILITIES IN THE INTEREST OF SOCIAL WELFARE FOR RECREATION AND LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION WITH THE OBJECTIVE OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE FOR THE RESIDENTS. IN FURTHERANCE OF THESE OBJECTS, BUT NOT OTHERWISE, THE TRUSTEES SHALL HAVE POWER: TO ESTABLISH OR TO SECURE THE ESTABLISHMENT OF A COMMUNITY CENTRE AND TO MAINTAIN AND MANAGER, OR TO CO-OPERATE WITH ANY STATUTORY AUTHORITY IN THE MAINTENANCE AND MANAGEMENT OF SUCH A CENTRE FOR ACTIVITIES PROMOTED BY THE CIO IN FURTHERANCE OF THE ABOVE OBJECTS.
Contact information
- Address:
-
19 GRENVILLE DRIVE
NEWCASTLE UPON TYNE
NE3 5PA
- Phone:
- 07532029847
- Website:
-
staidanscommunitycentre.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.