Trustees ABBEYFIELD (EAST DEVON) SOCIETY LIMITED

Charity number: 1206411
Recently registered

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

9 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Kevin Budden Chair 01 July 2019
ABBEYFIELD HONITON SOCIETY LIMITED (THE)
Received: On time
Rosemary Harris Trustee 02 October 2023
THE ABBEYFIELD TAUNTON DEFENDAMUS SOCIETY LIMITED
Overdue by 52 days
Colin Weeks Trustee 02 October 2023
THE ABBEYFIELD TAUNTON DEFENDAMUS SOCIETY LIMITED
Overdue by 52 days
David Lewis Trustee 02 October 2023
None on record
Ian Foot Trustee 01 July 2022
ABBEYFIELD HONITON SOCIETY LIMITED (THE)
Received: On time
Christopher Knee Trustee 01 May 2022
None on record
Carolyn Cox Trustee 01 July 2019
ABBEYFIELD HONITON SOCIETY LIMITED (THE)
Received: On time
Graham Cumming Trustee 01 July 2013
ABBEYFIELD HONITON SOCIETY LIMITED (THE)
Received: On time
Hilary Simon Trustee 01 July 2008
ABBEYFIELD HONITON SOCIETY LIMITED (THE)
Received: On time