HUTHWAITE MINERS'RECREATION GROUND
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Information on the charity's activities is not available.
What, who, how, where
- Nottinghamshire
Governance
- 30 December 1963: Standard registration
- 17 January 2006: Removed (Does not operate)
- HUTHWAITE MINERS'RECREATION (Previous name)
- HUTHWAITE WELFARE INSTITUTE AND RECREATION CENTRE (Previous name)
Financial history
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2005 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2005 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2004 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2004 | Not submitted |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
SCHEME DATED 13 APRIL 1992
Charitable objects
(1)THE OBJECT OF THE CHARITY SHALL BE THE PROVISION AND MAINTENANCE OF A RECREATION GROUND FOR THE USE OF THE INHABITANTS OF HUTHWAITE AND THE NEIGHBOURHOOD THEREOF (HEREINAFTER CALLED"THE AREA OF BENEFIT")WITHOUT DISTINCTION OF POLITICAL,RELIGIOUS OR OTHER OPINIONS,WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE FOR THE SAID INHABITANTS.(2)THE SAID LAND SHALL BE HELD UPON TRUST FOR THE PURPOSES OF A RECREATION GROUND AS AFORESAID.
Area of benefit
HUTHWAITE AND THE NEIGHBOURHOOD THERE OF
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.