Financial history WORKSOP UNIT 422 OF THE SEA CADET CORPS

Charity number: 522331
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021
Total gross income £14.01k £12.80k £23.05k £18.84k £24.51k
Total expenditure £16.14k £12.62k £36.33k £21.26k £15.11k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A £2.44k £16.34k