Accounts and annual returns 10TH BOSTON (NORTH RURAL) SCOUT GROUP

Charity number: 522355
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2021 04 February 2022 4 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2020 11 February 2021 11 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2019 11 February 2021 377 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2018 30 June 2019 150 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2017 24 March 2018 52 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2017 Not Required