Financial history 10TH BOSTON (NORTH RURAL) SCOUT GROUP

Charity number: 522355
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021
Total gross income £9.59k £9.59k £9.32k £9.59k £7.48k
Total expenditure £4.01k £5.58k £2.77k £3.91k £3.52k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A