3RD CLEETHORPES SCOUT GROUP

Charity number: 522372
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

10 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Michelle Charlton Trustee 15 July 2018 None on record
Dr Lee Scott Woolsey Trustee 30 March 2017
GRIMSBY AND CLEETHORPES DISTRICT SCOUT COUNCIL Received: On time
Sarah Louise Smith Trustee 01 June 2012 None on record
Carolyn Wilson Trustee 25 April 2017 None on record
Allister Neal Jack Trustee 28 February 2018 None on record
Rachel Anne Rushmer Trustee 20 August 2016
GRIMSBY AND CLEETHORPES DISTRICT SCOUT COUNCIL Received: On time
Monica Alicia Ana Maez Trustee 12 April 2021 None on record
Jane Marie Ward Trustee 22 July 2017 None on record
Rebecca Taylor Chair 22 November 2019 None on record
Sawaree Richardson Trustee 22 July 2017 None on record