16TH LINCOLN (ST NICHOLAS) SCOUT GROUP

Charity number: 522386
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2016 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020
Total gross income £2.74k £7.35k £5.28k £7.21k £1.79k
Total expenditure £3.05k £7.84k £6.13k £5.75k £438
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A