CARE4CATS RESCUE - TEESSIDE & NORTH YORKSHIRE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The charity provides appropriate care, protection, treatment and security for animals in need of care and attention by reason of sickness, maltreatment, poor circumstances or ill usage and educates the public in matters pertaining to animal welfare in general and the prevention of cruelty and suffering among animals.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2024
Total income includes £1,525 from 1 government grant(s)
People

4 Trustee(s)
5 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Animals
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Middlesbrough
- North Yorkshire
- Redcar And Cleveland
Governance
- 18 September 2023: CIO registration
- CARE4CATS RESCUE (Previous name)
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Clare Robson | Chair | 18 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Julie Hatch | Trustee | 20 November 2024 |
|
|
||||
Kathleen Constance ONeill | Trustee | 18 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Rachel Morgan | Trustee | 18 September 2023 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £46.54k | |
|
Total expenditure | £42.86k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £1.53k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2024 | 28 April 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2024 | 28 April 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 18 Sep 2023
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE HUMANE BEHAVIOUR TOWARDS ANIMALS, PARTICULARLY BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY CATS BY PROVIDING APPROPRIATE CARE, PROTECTION, TREATMENT AND SECURITY FOR ANIMALS WHICH ARE IN NEED OF CARE AND ATTENTION BY REASON OF SICKNESS, MALTREATMENT, POOR CIRCUMSTANCES OR ILL USAGE AND TO EDUCATE THE PUBLIC IN MATTERS PERTAINING TO ANIMAL WELFARE IN GENERAL AND THE PREVENTION OF CRUELTY AND SUFFERING AMONG ANIMALS.
Contact information
- Address:
-
3 HARTINGTON STREET
LOFTUS
SALTBURN-BY-THE-SEA
TS13 4SB
- Phone:
- 07748167780
- Email:
- care4catsrescue@gmail.com
- Website:
-
Care4catsrescue.co.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window