Trustees Church and Chetwynd Aston Village Hall
Charity number: 522491
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
12 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Paul James Fletcher | Trustee | 18 August 2021 |
|
|
||||
Andrew Stokes | Trustee | 23 September 2020 |
|
|
||||
Jennifer Cann | Trustee | 29 January 2020 |
|
|
||||
Anthony Cyril Del Manso | Trustee | 20 November 2019 |
|
|
||||
Elizabeth Janice Kemp | Trustee | 02 February 2019 |
|
|
||||
John Edward Debenham | Trustee | 02 February 2019 |
|
|
||||
Bridget Page | Trustee | 02 February 2019 |
|
|
||||
Harnarine Murally | Trustee | 02 February 2019 |
|
|
||||
John Masters | Trustee | 01 February 2017 |
|
|
||||
Dr Malcolm Bennett | Trustee | 01 September 2015 |
|
|
||||
PHILIP GILLUM | Trustee |
|
||||||
MABEL MARGRET KENDALL KNIGHT | Trustee |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.