THE TELFORD SPORT & RECREATION TRUST

Charity number: 522510
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2020 12 November 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2019 27 November 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2018 25 September 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2017 15 September 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2017 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2016 01 July 2016 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2016 Not Required