Financial history TELFORD UNIT 405 OF THE SEA CADET CORPS

Charity number: 522580
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021
Total gross income £8.60k £12.97k £18.59k £26.78k £37.74k
Total expenditure £10.20k £14.72k £18.91k £17.78k £6.55k
Income from government contracts N/A £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £0 N/A N/A £25.10k