ROUS LENCH AND RADFORD COMMUNITY GARDEN
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
We run a community garden and allotments. We rent allotment plots to local tenants and maintain a community garden for use by the public, including running events to fund ongoing maintenance.
What, who, how, where
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Worcestershire
Governance
- 25 September 2023: CIO registration
No other names
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Laura Bradley | Chair | 01 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
Catriona Blair Whitfield | Trustee | 11 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
Ben Cashmore | Trustee | 02 March 2024 |
|
|
Financial history
Accounts and annual returns
Governing document
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 25 Sep 2023
Charitable objects
TO PROVIDE FACILITIES FOR RECREATION OR OTHER LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION BY PROVIDING AN AREA FOR USE AS A COMMUNITY GARDEN AND ALLOTMENT AND OTHER ACTIVITIES FOR INDIVIDUALS IN WORCESTERSHIRE AND THE SURROUNDING AREAS, WHO HAVE NEED OF SUCH FACILITIES BY REASON OF THEIR YOUTH, AGE, INFIRMITY OR DISABLEMENT, FINANCIAL HARDSHIP OR SOCIAL AND ECONOMIC CIRCUMSTANCES OR FOR THE PUBLIC AT LARGE IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE AND WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE CONDITION OF LIFE OF THE SAID INHABITANTS.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Court Hill House
Rous Lench
EVESHAM
WR11 4UJ
- Phone:
- 01386793203
- Email:
- rlargrow@gmail.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.