BIGNALL END MINERS WELFARE INSTITUTE AND RECREATION GROUND

Charity number: 522607
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 November 2020 22 July 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 November 2020 22 July 2021 On time Download
Annual return 30 November 2019 31 July 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 November 2019 31 July 2020 On time Download
Annual return 30 November 2018 13 August 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 November 2018 13 August 2019 On time Download
Annual return 30 November 2017 09 August 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 November 2017

(These accounts
have been qualified)

09 August 2018 On time Download
Annual return 30 November 2016 28 August 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 November 2016

(These accounts
have been qualified)

28 August 2017 On time Download