BIGNALL END MINERS WELFARE INSTITUTE AND RECREATION GROUND

Charity number: 522607
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 30/11/2016 30/11/2017 30/11/2018 30/11/2019 30/11/2020
Total gross income £70.33k £62.61k £57.21k £60.58k £38.02k
Total expenditure £69.30k £60.13k £56.35k £58.49k £37.68k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A