Accounts and annual returns BURTON ON TRENT UNIT 61 OF THE SEA CADET CORPS

Charity number: 522626
Charity reporting is overdue by 969 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2021 Overdue Overdue by 238 days
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 Overdue Overdue by 238 days
Annual return 31 March 2020 19 August 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 19 August 2020 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2019 31 January 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 Overdue Overdue by 969 days
Annual return 31 March 2018 25 January 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2017 31 August 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2017 Not Required