ABBOTS BROMLEY VILLAGE HALL

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Provides buildings/facilities/open space
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
Total income includes £660 from 660 government grant(s)
People

4 Trustee(s)
6 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Amateur Sport
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Staffordshire
Governance
- 02 August 1963: Standard registration
- ABBOTS BROMLEY AND DISTRICT INSTITUTE (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
SIMON ALEX WILSON | Chair |
|
|
|||||
Paul Maidstone | Trustee | 01 May 2017 |
|
|||||
DAVID THOMPSON | Trustee | 11 October 2011 |
|
|
||||
LIZ LAMPARD | Trustee | 11 October 2011 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £21.63k | £40.74k | £39.87k | £30.32k | £47.45k | |
|
Total expenditure | £19.88k | £24.96k | £23.64k | £48.72k | £24.49k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | £141 | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £31.40k | £28.25k | £5.60k | £660 |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 24 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 24 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 11 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 11 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 23 August 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 23 August 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 09 September 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 09 September 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 27 July 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 29TH JUNE 1949
Charitable objects
VILLAGE HALL
Area of benefit
CIVIL PARISH OF ABBOTS BROMLEY AND ITS IMMEDIATE VICINITY
Contact information
- Address:
-
Lane adjacent to Wilson's Butchers
Bagot Street
Abbots Bromley
RUGELEY
Staffordshire
WS15 3DB
- Phone:
- 07794422996
- Email:
- abvillagehall@gmail.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window