LEA HALL MINERS WELFARE CENTRE

Charity number: 522715
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 30/06/2016 30/06/2017 30/06/2018 30/06/2019 30/06/2020
Total gross income £83.12k £59.80k £69.87k £63.08k £75.06k
Total expenditure £121.93k £91.01k £93.65k £80.17k £89.20k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A