LEA HALL MINERS WELFARE CENTRE

Charity number: 522715
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

7 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Malcolm Watkiss Trustee 01 April 2016 None on record
Claire Louise Gilbey Trustee 02 August 2020 None on record
Dennis Southwell Trustee 27 March 2018 None on record
Shaun Leonard Frederick Lawton Chair 02 August 2020 None on record
Christine Elizabeth Martin Trustee 08 August 2021 None on record
Iain Alexander Murray Trustee 08 August 2021 None on record
Samuel White Trustee 02 April 2017 None on record