RANGEMORE RECREATION GROUND

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Provision of facilities at and maintenance of Rangemore Playing Fields
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2024
People

3 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Amateur Sport
- Other Defined Groups
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Staffordshire
Governance
- 07 August 1968: Standard registration
No other names
- Conflicting interests
- Paying staff
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
BEVERLEY JANE PARKER | Trustee | 30 October 2024 |
|
|
||||
STUART BRABBIN | Trustee | 30 October 2024 |
|
|
||||
VERNON FREDRICK BASS | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | 31/12/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £4.14k | £4.08k | £18.66k | £12.74k | £7.70k | |
|
Total expenditure | £5.55k | £3.06k | £12.71k | £15.65k | £5.92k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | £15.34k | £2.29k | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2024 | 28 March 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 10 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 31 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 10 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 08 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
INDENTURE DATED 1 APRIL 1896.
Charitable objects
A PUBLIC GROUND FOR THE USE OF THE INHABITANTS OF THE BENEFICIAL AREA.
Area of benefit
CHAPELRY OF ALL SAINTS, RANGEMORE
Contact information
- Address:
-
Rangemore Estate
Knightley Farm
Callingwood,Needwood
BURTON-ON-TRENT
Staffordshire
DE13 9PU
- Phone:
- 01283711612
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window