THE HAMSTEAD SOCIAL WELFARE CENTRE

Charity number: 522747
Charity reporting is overdue by 961 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2020 Overdue Overdue by 230 days
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 Overdue Overdue by 230 days
Annual return 31 March 2019 Overdue Overdue by 596 days
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 Overdue Overdue by 596 days
Annual return 31 March 2018 Overdue Overdue by 961 days
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 Overdue Overdue by 961 days
Annual return 31 March 2017 31 January 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2017 14 March 2018 42 days late Download
Annual return 31 March 2016 06 March 2017 34 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2016 07 February 2017 7 days late Download