THE BAMPTON PLAYERS

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Bampton Players stage dramatic performances, by the community for the community in Bampton in Devon. They stage plays and pantomimes indoors at the local Riverside Hall, outside during the annual Bampton Charter Fair and in a purpose built open air theatre in Bampton.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2024
People

8 Trustee(s)
45 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Other Charitable Activities
- Devon
Governance
- 04 October 2023: CIO registration
- 04 January 2024: Funds received from 277774 THE BAMPTON PLAYERS
No other names
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Roger Erskine-Hill | Chair | 05 March 2025 |
|
|
||||
Sylvia Frances Wakeham | Trustee | 20 March 2024 |
|
|
||||
Judith Mary Kelland | Trustee | 20 March 2024 |
|
|
||||
Avril Saxby | Trustee | 04 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
Garry Girling | Trustee | 04 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
Wendy Boothroyd | Trustee | 04 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
Susan Shaw | Trustee | 04 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
Xanda Vass B Sc | Trustee | 04 October 2023 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £4.68k | |
|
Total expenditure | £3.04k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2024 | 22 March 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2024 | 22 March 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - ASSOCIATION Registered 04 Oct 2023
Charitable objects
THE OBJECT FOR WHICH THE SOCIETY IS ESTABLISHED IS TO PROMOTE THE ADVANCEMENT AND IMPROVEMENT OF GENERAL EDUCATION IN RELATION TO ALL ASPECTS OF THE ART OF DRAMA AND THE DEVELOPMENT OF PUBLIC APPRECIATION OF SUCH ART.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Primrose Cottage
Morebath
TIVERTON
Devon
EX16 9DA
- Phone:
- 07805825910
- Email:
- players@bampton.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window