Accounts and annual returns THE WALL HEATH COMMUNITY ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 522810
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2020 13 October 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2019 14 October 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 14 October 2020 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2018 24 October 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2018 14 October 2020 349 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2017 16 October 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2017 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2016 27 October 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2016 Not Required