DORDON MINERS WELFARE INSTITUTE

Charity number: 522923
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Sports and recreation activities

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023

Total income: £4,295
Total expenditure: £34,494

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

No information available

Trustee payments

No information available

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Amateur Sport
Who the charity helps:
  • Other Defined Groups
How the charity helps:
  • Makes Grants To Organisations
  • Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
Where the charity operates:
  • Staffordshire
  • Warwickshire

Governance

Registration history:
  • 20 September 1963: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
No policies declared
Land and property:
This charity owns and/or leases land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

4 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Stuart Taylor Trustee 14 March 2023
None on record
DAVID SALES Trustee 26 March 2019
None on record
Harry Irving Trustee 06 February 2019
None on record
ROGER KENDALL Trustee
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £13.69k £17.19k £23.83k £4.70k £4.30k
Total expenditure £16.95k £8.91k £11.76k £17.35k £34.49k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £10.00k N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2023 06 June 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2022 19 June 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2021 07 July 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2020 08 June 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2019 22 September 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 Not Required
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
BROWNS LANE
DORDON
TAMWORTH STAFFS
B78 1TL
Phone:
01827330296
Website:

No information available