Trustees THE KING GEORGE VI MEMORIAL HALL
Charity number: 522934

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
11 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
MELANIE Davies | Chair | 18 September 2012 |
|
|
||||
Emma Rowe | Trustee | 07 July 2024 |
|
|
||||
Vivienne Thoms | Trustee | 15 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
Graeme Findlay | Trustee | 07 July 2023 |
|
|
||||
Sarah Elliot | Trustee | 26 August 2021 |
|
|
||||
Nova Storey | Trustee | 26 August 2021 |
|
|
||||
Angela Haden | Trustee | 16 October 2017 |
|
|
||||
Doug Brown | Trustee | 30 July 2015 |
|
|
||||
Isobel Walker | Trustee | 07 July 2010 |
|
|
||||
Valerie Sperry | Trustee | 01 January 2010 |
|
|
||||
DERRICK HANCOCK | Trustee |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.