GRIFF & COTON SPORTS & MINERS WELFARE CHARITY

Charity number: 522976
Charity reporting is up to date (19 days late)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2020 19 November 2021 19 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 19 November 2021 19 days late Download
Annual return 31 December 2019 30 October 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 07 December 2020 37 days late Download
Annual return 31 December 2018 02 November 2019 2 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2018 28 December 2019 58 days late Download
Annual return 31 December 2017 19 November 2018 19 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2017 23 January 2019 84 days late Download
Annual return 31 December 2016 22 November 2017 22 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2016 11 January 2018 72 days late Download