GRIFF & COTON SPORTS & MINERS WELFARE CHARITY

Charity number: 522976
Charity reporting is up to date (19 days late)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020
Total gross income £241.65k £243.55k £279.09k £192.31k £98.52k
Total expenditure £234.38k £237.81k £263.24k £181.83k £79.08k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A £27.00k