BA ALAWI MASTERS HERITAGE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Provides digital sources for education for Islam
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 November 2024
People

3 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Throughout England
Governance
- 04 March 2024: CIO registration
No other names
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Ikram Ul-Haq | Chair | 01 December 2023 |
|
|
||||
Mohammed Hashem Almusawa | Trustee | 01 December 2023 |
|
|
||||
AMIN ALI OLIVER DESMOND BUXTON | Trustee | 01 December 2023 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/11/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £11.13k | |
|
Total expenditure | £11.57k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 November 2024 | 19 March 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 November 2024 | 19 March 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 04 Mar 2024
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE CIO ARE TO ADVANCE THE RELIGION OF ISLAM WORLDWIDE FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC IN PARTICULAR BY EDUCATING THE PUBLIC IN SUFISM AND BY PROMOTING THE STUDY OF ISLAMIC TEACHINGS, PRACTICES AND SCRIPTURES VIA DIGITAL PLATFORMS.
Contact information
- Address:
-
BA ALAWI MASTERS HERITAGE
Lytchett House
13 Freeland Park
Wareham Road
Dorset
Poole
- Phone:
- 02038972241
- Email:
- admin@baalwi.net
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window