HAGLEY COMMUNITY ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 523146
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2016 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020
Total gross income £61.95k £106.74k £131.23k £61.97k £60.93k
Total expenditure £45.62k £61.48k £47.61k £52.04k £51.68k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £59.51k N/A N/A N/A