Accounts and annual returns HEIGHINGTON VILLAGE HALL

Charity number: 523153
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 July 2023 15 April 2024 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 July 2022 26 June 2023 26 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 July 2021 23 February 2023 268 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 July 2020 23 June 2021 23 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2020 23 June 2021 23 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 July 2019 19 March 2021 292 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2019 Not Required