Accounts and annual returns HESLINGTON SPORTSFIELD

Charity number: 523247
Charity reporting is overdue by 537 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2023 Overdue Overdue by 172 days
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 Overdue Overdue by 172 days
Annual return 31 March 2022 Overdue Overdue by 537 days
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 Overdue Overdue by 537 days
Annual return 31 March 2021 03 August 2022 184 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2020 26 March 2021 54 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2019 27 February 2020 27 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 Not Required