Financial history GUISBOROUGH AND EAST CLEVELAND UNIT 532 OF THE SEA CADET CORPS

Charity number: 523353
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021
Total gross income £33.09k £9.54k £19.94k £12.07k £23.57k
Total expenditure £25.29k £9.51k £13.69k £3.11k £4.63k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A £500 £10.00k £22.14k