ARMTHORPE MINERS' WELFARE RECREATION GROUND

Charity number: 523472
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020
Total gross income £59.11k £95.06k £67.45k £66.55k £80.52k
Total expenditure £60.59k £84.28k £55.67k £67.61k £55.45k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A £20.00k