WHARNCLIFFE WOODMOOR MINERS' WELFARE SCHEME

Charity number: 523537
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2020 08 January 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 08 January 2021 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2019 20 January 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 20 January 2020 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2018 15 January 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 15 January 2019 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2017 06 April 2018 65 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2017 06 April 2018 65 days late Download
Annual return 31 March 2016 26 January 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2016 26 January 2017 On time Download