WHARNCLIFFE WOODMOOR MINERS' WELFARE SCHEME

Charity number: 523537
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2016 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020
Total gross income £33.52k £32.96k £32.24k £32.70k £33.44k
Total expenditure £33.52k £32.96k £32.24k £32.70k £33.44k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £31.64k £31.08k £30.55k £30.87k £32.04k