FRYSTON COLLIERY WELFARE RECREATION CLUB

Charity number: 523539
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 June 2020 30 April 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2020 30 April 2021 On time Download
Annual return 30 June 2019 19 March 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2019 19 March 2020 On time Download
Annual return 30 June 2018 27 February 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2018 27 February 2019 On time Download
Annual return 30 June 2017 27 March 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2017 28 March 2018 On time Download
Annual return 30 June 2016 01 February 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2016 01 February 2017 On time Download