FRYSTON COLLIERY WELFARE RECREATION CLUB

Charity number: 523539
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

8 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
MALCOLM AGAR Trustee 09 October 2018 None on record
REGINALD ALLEN Trustee None on record
BRIAN COPLEY MR Trustee None on record
Robert Anthony Owen Trustee 14 September 2014 None on record
Kevin Tolson MR Trustee 01 April 2016 None on record
KIM COOPER Trustee 21 January 2018 None on record
Dawn Smith Trustee 10 June 2014 None on record
BERNARD ROTHWELL Trustee 07 June 2012 None on record