Financial history SOUTH YORKSHIRE COUNTY SCOUT COUNCIL

Charity number: 523546
Charity reporting is overdue by 81 days
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022
Total gross income £362.51k £413.72k £634.30k £224.66k £332.58k
Total expenditure £348.42k £390.46k £555.20k £248.99k £320.70k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A £41.94k N/A
Income - Donations and legacies N/A N/A £15 N/A N/A
Income - Other trading activities N/A N/A £0 N/A N/A
Income - Charitable activities N/A N/A £409.17k N/A N/A
Income - Endowments N/A N/A £0 N/A N/A
Income - Investment N/A N/A £10.95k N/A N/A
Income - Other N/A N/A £214.16k N/A N/A
Income - Legacies N/A N/A £0 N/A N/A
Expenditure - Charitable activities N/A N/A £532.26k N/A N/A
Expenditure - Raising funds N/A N/A £22.95k N/A N/A
Expenditure - Governance N/A N/A £600 N/A N/A
Expenditure - Grants institution N/A N/A £0 N/A N/A
Expenditure - Investment management N/A N/A £0 N/A N/A
Expenditure - Other N/A N/A £0 N/A N/A