Accounts and annual returns DENABY AND CADEBY MINERS WELFARE INSTITUTE AND RECREATION GROUND

Charity number: 523553
Charity reporting is overdue by 235 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2022 Overdue Overdue by 235 days
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2022 Overdue Overdue by 235 days
Annual return 31 December 2021 24 October 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2020 19 October 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2019 20 November 2020 20 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2018 22 August 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2018 22 August 2019 On time Download Open in new window