Accounts and annual returns ABERCRAVE AND DISTRICT MINERS WELFARE INSTITUTE AND RECREATION GROUND

Charity number: 523652
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2021 27 October 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 27 October 2022 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2020 27 October 2022 361 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2019 21 December 2020 51 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2018 31 October 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2018 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2017 30 October 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2017 Not Required