ABERCRAVE AND DISTRICT MINERS WELFARE INSTITUTE AND RECREATION GROUND

Charity number: 523652
Charity reporting is overdue by 28 days
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/12/2015 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019
Total gross income £9.95k £9.81k £9.40k £12.67k £16.51k
Total expenditure £5.61k £5.16k £5.65k £14.37k £15.44k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A