THE BRECONSHIRE FEDERATION OF YOUNG FARMERS' CLUBS

Charity number: 523668
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2018 Overdue Overdue by 884 days
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2018 Overdue Overdue by 884 days
Annual return 31 August 2017 13 October 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2017

(These accounts
have been qualified)

13 October 2017 On time
Annual return 31 August 2016 09 February 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2016

(These accounts
have been qualified)

09 February 2017 On time
Annual return 31 August 2015 31 August 2016 62 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2015

(These accounts
have been qualified)

31 August 2016 62 days late
Annual return 31 August 2014 28 October 2015 120 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2014

(These accounts
have been qualified)

31 August 2016 428 days late